+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0045)
On March 7, 2006 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 45 (effective 7/1/06)
On February 23, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 2006 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB537ER)
On February 17, 2006 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 16, 2006 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 15, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Read first time
On January 26, 2006 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2006 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 24, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 066120107
+ − Votes (5)
February 17, 2006: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2006: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2006: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2006: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2006: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor