+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 8, 2002 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0687)
On April 6, 2002 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 687 (effective 7/1/02)
On March 7, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2002 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 6, 2002 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB537ER)
On February 28, 2002 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 27, 2002 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 26, 2002 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 22, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2002 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 11, 2002 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2002 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 7, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2002 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/09/02 024450246