+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0262)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 262 (effective 7/1/14)
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB536ER)
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB536S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 14104533D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 14104533D-S1
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Health Professions
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100889D
+ − Votes (7)
February 21, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2014: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2014: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 7, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2014: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor