+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 7, 1994 in the House:
- No action taken by Courts of Justice by voice vote
On March 4, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On February 15, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On February 14, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 11, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed LD8823739 (SB532S1)
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub. (14-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Votes (4)
February 11, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
February 10, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1994: Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub. (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor