+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 5, 2000 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0990)
On April 9, 2000 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 990 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 16, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 16, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 14, 2000 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 13, 2000 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB531ER)
On February 28, 2000 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 7-N)
- Passed House (91-Y 7-N)
- Read third time
On February 25, 2000 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 23, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (19-Y 6-N)
On February 15, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 4
On February 14, 2000 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
On February 7, 2000 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (37-Y 1-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 1-N)
On February 4, 2000 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 008187560-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On February 3, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws with amd (12-Y 1-N)
On January 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed 008187560