+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 17, 2006 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0755)
On April 5, 2006 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 755 (effective 7/1/06)
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB531ER)
On February 21, 2006 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 20, 2006 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 16, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Read first time
On January 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2006 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 25, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 062668776
+ − Votes (5)
February 21, 2006: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2006: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2006: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2006: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2006: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor