+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 625 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0625)
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 6, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB531ER)
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Taken up out of order pursuant to House Rule 52 (96-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (96-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Passed House (96-Y 3-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 3-N)
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (19-Y 3-N)
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (9-Y 1-N)
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102198D
- Referred to Committee on Finance
+ − Votes (7)
February 28, 2018: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 3-N)
February 28, 2018: VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (96-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2018: Reported from Finance (19-Y 3-N)
February 21, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2018: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2018: Reported from Finance (9-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor