+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (47)
On April 28, 2000 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0729)
On April 8, 2000 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 729 (effective 1/1/01)
On March 22, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 20, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 20, 2000 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 14, 2000 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB530ER)
On March 1, 2000 in the House:
- Passed House with sub. with amendments (70-Y 25-N)
- Read third time
- Committee substitute agreed to 002867880-H1
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. w/amds. 002867880-EH1
- Amendments by Del. Rust agreed to
- VOTE: PASSAGE (70-Y 25-N)
On March 1, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute with amendments waived
- Passed by temporarily
- House sub. w/amds. agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (39-Y 0-N)
On February 29, 2000 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute printed 002867880-H1
On February 28, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with sub (15-Y 6-N)
On February 21, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 18, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (37-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (36-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (36-Y 0-N)
- Amendments by Sen. Williams reconsidered (37-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
- Amendments by Sen. Williams rejected
- Reengrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 008442220-S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 17, 2000 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 008442220-S1
- Reading of amendments waived
- Amendments by Sen. Williams agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. w/amds. 008442220-ES1
- Printed as engrossed 008442220-ES1
On February 16, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2000 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 008442220-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N 1-A)
On January 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed 002681220