+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0617)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 617 (effective 7/1/20)
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
On March 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB53ER)
- Enrolled
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Assigned HWI sub: Health Professions
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB53S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 20107751D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 20107751D-S1
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Health Professions
On January 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Education and Health
- Rereferred from Rehabilitation and Social Services (11-Y 0-N)
On November 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100386D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Votes (8)
February 28, 2020: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2020: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2020: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2020: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2020: Rereferred from Rehabilitation and Social Services (11-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
William M. Stanley, Jr.
Type:
Primary Sponsor