+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0024)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 24 (effective 7/1/22)
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 9, 2022
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB529ER)
- Enrolled
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 25, 2022 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Read first time
On February 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB529S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 22106298D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 22106298D-S1
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100748D