+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (61)
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, May 18, 2018
- Reenrolled bill Communicated to Governor on 4/18/18
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (SB526ER2)
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted in-part
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N 1-A)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation amendments #3 and 4 (94-Y 0-N 1-A)
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation amendments #3, #4 (39-Y 0-N)
- Amendments #1, #2 Passed by for the day
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 26, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB526ER)
- Enrolled
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (84-Y 14-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (84-Y 14-N)
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference substitute printed 18108152D-S3
- Amended by conference committee
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N)
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- House insisted on substitute
- House requested conference committee
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- House substitute rejected by Senate (2-Y 38-N)
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Obenshain, Stanley, Lucas
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Bell, Robert B., Gilbert, Mullin
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee substitute agreed to 18107309D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB526H1
- Passed House with substitute (80-Y 18-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 18-N)
- Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
- Passed by until the end of the calendar
- Passed House with substitute 18107309D-H1 (78-Y 19-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (78-Y 19-N)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 18107309D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 3-N)
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N)
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB526S2
- Substitute by Senator Obenshain agreed to 18106122D-S2
- Floor substitute printed 18106122D-S2 (Obenshain)
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute rejected 18104997D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 18104997D-S1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104450D
+ − Votes (13)
April 18, 2018: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N 1-A)
March 9, 2018: VOTE: ADOPTION (84-Y 14-N)
March 9, 2018: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
March 8, 2018: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N)
March 8, 2018: House substitute rejected by Senate (2-Y 38-N)
March 7, 2018: VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 18-N)
March 7, 2018: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (78-Y 19-N)
March 2, 2018: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 3-N)
February 21, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N)
January 30, 2018: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2018: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor