+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0097)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 97 (effective 7/1/14)
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB526ER)
- Enrolled
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (19-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (34-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Health Professions
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101688D
+ − Votes (5)
February 17, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2014: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (19-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2014: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (34-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2014: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor