+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 14, 2000 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0449)
On April 4, 2000 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 449 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 17, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 16, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 16, 2000 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 14, 2000 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB522ER)
On March 2, 2000 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N)
- Passed House (97-Y 1-N)
- Read third time
On March 1, 2000 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 29, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. (22-Y 3-N)
On February 16, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 14, 2000 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (31-Y 6-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (31-Y 6-N)
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (32-Y 7-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (32-Y 7-N)
On February 11, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (10-Y 4-N 1-A)
On January 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed 005628424
+ − Votes (8)
March 2, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N)
February 29, 2000: Reported from Tra. (22-Y 3-N)
February 14, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE (32-Y 7-N)
February 14, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE (31-Y 6-N)
February 14, 2000: VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2000: Reported from Transportation (10-Y 4-N 1-A)
+ − Sponsors (39)
Type:
Primary Sponsor