+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0531)
On March 10, 2008 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 531 (effective 7/1/08)
On March 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB520ER)
- Enrolled
On February 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N)
On February 26, 2008 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
On February 25, 2008 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 22, 2008 in the House:
- Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Read first time
On January 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2008 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 089834348-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB520E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On January 18, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 089834348
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
February 28, 2008: House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N)
February 26, 2008: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2008: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2008: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
January 16, 2008: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor