+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On February 23, 1994 in the House:
- No action taken by Finance by voice vote
On February 22, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 3
On February 12, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
On February 11, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 1994 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Fin. sub-committee: Trans/Special Grants
On January 12, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Votes (4)
February 10, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
February 10, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1994: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 8, 1994: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor