+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On February 13, 2002 in the Senate:
- Left in Finance
On January 14, 2002 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On January 11, 2002 in the Senate:
- Read first time
On January 10, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from Ed. & H. with amendment (11-Y 4-N)
On January 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/27/01 022285420
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
January 10, 2002: Reported from Ed. & H. with amendment (11-Y 4-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor