+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0590)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 590 (effective 7/1/22)
On March 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB519ER)
- Enrolled
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (84-Y 16-N)
- Passed House (84-Y 16-N)
- Read third time
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (18-Y 4-N)
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 9-N)
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB519S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 22105255D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 22105255D-S1
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (13-Y 2-N)
On January 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned GL&T sub: Gaming
On January 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22104248D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
March 1, 2022: VOTE: Passage (84-Y 16-N)
February 24, 2022: Reported from General Laws (18-Y 4-N)
February 8, 2022: Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 9-N)
February 4, 2022: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2022: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (13-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor