+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 22, 1996 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0205)
On March 16, 1996 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 205 (effective 7/1/96)
On March 5, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 4, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 4, 1996 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 27, 1996 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB518ER)
On February 20, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 19, 1996 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 16, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Read first time
On February 13, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 12, 1996 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 9, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp. (39-Y 0-N), passed by for the day
On February 8, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 1996 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Ed. & Health sub-committee: Higher Education
On January 22, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented & ordered printed 960874807
+ − Votes (6)
February 20, 1996: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1996: Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 8, 1996: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor