+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 9, 1996 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0572)
On April 4, 1996 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 572 (effective 7/1/96)
On March 22, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 21, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 20, 1996 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 13, 1996 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB515ER)
On March 5, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 4-N)
- Passed House (96-Y 4-N)
- Read third time
On March 4, 1996 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 1, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from Count., Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to C. C. T. sub-committee: 4
On February 10, 1996 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
On February 9, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 8, 1996 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 7, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp. (40-Y 0-N), passed by for the day
On February 6, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Presented & ordered printed 961315719
+ − Votes (6)
March 5, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 4-N)
March 1, 1996: Reported from Count., Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N)
February 8, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 7, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 1996: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor