+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (61)
On April 19, 1994 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0779)
On April 11, 1994 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 779 (effective 7/1/94)
On April 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 1, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB513ER)
On March 11, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (29-Y 9-N)
- Reading of conference report waived
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (29-Y 9-N)
On March 11, 1994 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to by House (86-Y 12-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (86-Y 12-N)
On March 11, 1994 in the Senate:
- House substitute accepted by conference committee
- Amended by conference committee
On March 10, 1994 in the House:
- House insisted on substitute with amendment
On March 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute with amendments waived
- Passed by temporarily
- House sub. w/amds. rejected by Senate (15-Y 23-N)
- VOTE: REJECTED HOUSE AMENDMENT (15-Y 23-N)
On March 10, 1994 in the House:
- Delegates: Armstrong, Councill, Watkins
- House requested conference committee
On March 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ACCEDE TO REQ. FOR CONF (39-Y 0-N)
On March 10, 1994 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
On March 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Nolen, Reasor, Calhoun
On March 9, 1994 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee substitute reconsidered
- Committee substitute rejected
- Substitute by Del. Armstrong agreed to
- Amendment by Del. Armstrong agreed to
- Amendment by Del. Dudley agreed to
- Motion to rerefer to committee rejected
- Motion for pending question agreed to
- Engrossed by House - floor substitute with amds.
- Passed House with sub. with amendments (69-Y 29-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (69-Y 29-N)
- Floor substitute printed LD8367721 (SB513H2)
On March 8, 1994 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Read third time
On March 7, 1994 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 4, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture w/substitute (14-Y 6-N)
- Committee substitute printed LD4971721 (SB513H1)
On February 22, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to Agriculture sub-committee: 3
On February 15, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Read first time
On February 14, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 11, 1994 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (37-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed LD5763721 (SB513S1)
On February 7, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. w/sub. (13-Y 1-N)
On January 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (9)
March 11, 1994: VOTE: ADOPTION (86-Y 12-N)
March 11, 1994: VOTE: ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (29-Y 9-N)
March 10, 1994: VOTE: REJECTED HOUSE AMENDMENT (15-Y 23-N)
March 10, 1994: VOTE: ACCEDE TO REQ. FOR CONF (39-Y 0-N)
March 9, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (69-Y 29-N)
March 4, 1994: Reported from Agriculture w/substitute (14-Y 6-N)
February 11, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (37-Y 0-N)
February 8, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 7, 1994: Reported from A. C. & N. R. w/sub. (13-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor