+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0533)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 533 (effective 7/1/18)
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 14, 2018
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB513ER)
- Enrolled
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Passed House (98-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Read third time
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N 2-A)
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104513D
+ − Votes (5)
February 28, 2018: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 15, 2018: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2018: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N 2-A)
January 24, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2018: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor