+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 19, 1994 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0778)
On April 11, 1994 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 778 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 12, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB512ER)
On February 28, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 25, 1994 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 24, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. (21-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 2
On February 16, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
On February 15, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 11, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed LD8356687 (SB512S1)
- Reported from Ed. & H. with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented and ordered printed