+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 280 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0280)
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 2, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 9, 2018
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB511ER)
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 18105985D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB511S1
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 18105985D-S1
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 1-N)
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101601D
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
+ − Votes (6)
February 22, 2018: House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2018: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2018: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2018: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor