+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0263)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 263 (effective 7/1/16)
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 7, 2016
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/29/16
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB51ER)
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On December 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced bill reprinted 16101360D
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101360D
+ − Votes (5)
February 24, 2016: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2016: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2016: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2016: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor