+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 153 (effective 7/1/14)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0153)
On February 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB51ER)
- Enrolled
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (75-Y 19-N)
- Passed House with amendments (75-Y 19-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (17-Y 4-N)
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Read first time
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 7-N)
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB51S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 14104069D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 14104069D-S1
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (10-Y 5-N)
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N)
On December 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102000D