+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0807)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
On April 21, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (95-Y 0-N)
- Reenrolled
On April 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reenrolled bill text (SB509ER2)
On April 21, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 21, 2010 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 807 (effective 7/1/10)
On April 20, 2010 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 13, 2010 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 13, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 11, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB509ER)
- Enrolled
On March 3, 2010 in the House:
- Read third time
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 1, 2010 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 26, 2010 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: #1
On February 16, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103821D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
April 21, 2010: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
April 21, 2010: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
March 3, 2010: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2010: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2010: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2010: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2010: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2010: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor