+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 10, 1996 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0587)
On April 5, 1996 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 587 (effective 7/1/96)
On March 11, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 11, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 11, 1996 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 8, 1996 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB508ER)
On February 23, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 22, 1996 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 21, 1996 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 20, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. (22-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
On February 14, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 13, 1996 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute agreed to 967516719-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 967516719-S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 12, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp. (39-Y 0-N), passed by for the day
On February 9, 1996 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 967516719-S1
- Reported from R. & S. S. with sub. (14-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 1996 in the Senate:
- Assigned to R. & S. S. sub-committee: Prisons/Corrections
On January 22, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Presented & ordered printed 963334817
+ − Votes (8)
February 23, 1996: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 20, 1996: Reported from H. W. I. (22-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1996: VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1996: Reported from R. & S. S. with sub. (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor