+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On September 22, 2020 in the House:
- Tabled in Courts of Justice (13-Y 7-N)
On September 17, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On September 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On September 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed by temporarily
- Reading of substitute waived
- Substitute by Senator Surovell agreed to (20-Y 18-N)
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute with amendment SB5050ES1
- Title replaced 20201065D-S1
- Printed as engrossed 20201065D-ES1
- Amendment by Senator Obenshain agreed to
On September 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On September 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Floor substitute printed 20201065D-S1 (Surovell)
On August 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
- Committee amendments rejected
- Committee amendments reconsidered (36-Y 0-N)
- Passed by for the day
On August 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On August 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (34-Y 0-N)
On August 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (10-Y 4-N)
On August 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 08/18/20 20200490D
+ − Impact Statements (4)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
September 22, 2020: Tabled in Courts of Justice (13-Y 7-N)
September 9, 2020: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
September 4, 2020: Substitute by Senator Surovell agreed to (20-Y 18-N)
August 28, 2020: Committee amendments reconsidered (36-Y 0-N)
August 26, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (34-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Mark D. Obenshain
Type:
Primary Sponsor