+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0344)
On March 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 344 (effective 3/4/08)
On February 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 27, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 27, 2008 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB505ER)
- Enrolled
On February 26, 2008 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 25, 2008 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 22, 2008 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (19-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
On January 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 083011272-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB505E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On January 24, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2008 in the Senate:
- Introduced bill reprinted 083011272
On January 9, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/10/07 083011272
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 26, 2008: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2008: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (19-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2008: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2008: Reported from Local Government with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor