+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (38)
On March 12, 1994 in the House:
- Stricken from House calendar
On March 9, 1994 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
On March 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- Senators: Colgan, Cross, Chichester
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- VOTE: ACCEDE TO REQ. FOR CONF (38-Y 0-N)
- Senate acceded to request (38-Y 0-N)
On March 9, 1994 in the House:
- Delegates: Cranwell, Jackson, Miller
On March 7, 1994 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
- House insisted on substitute
On March 4, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- VOTE: REJECTED HOUSE AMENDMENT (1-Y 38-N)
- House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 38-N)
On March 2, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (83-Y 13-N)
- Passed House with substitute (83-Y 13-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Read third time
On March 1, 1994 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 28, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with sub. (20-Y 2-N)
- Committee substitute printed LD7219168 (SB503H1)
On February 17, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read first time
On February 16, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 15, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 1994 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed LD7188605 (SB503S1)
- Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Votes (8)
March 9, 1994: VOTE: ACCEDE TO REQ. FOR CONF (38-Y 0-N)
March 4, 1994: VOTE: REJECTED HOUSE AMENDMENT (1-Y 38-N)
March 2, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (83-Y 13-N)
February 28, 1994: Reported from Appropriations with sub. (20-Y 2-N)
February 15, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1994: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor