+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 5, 2006 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0323)
On March 30, 2006 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 323 (effective 3/30/06)
On March 8, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2006 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB503ER)
On February 28, 2006 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 27, 2006 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 24, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Read first time
On January 30, 2006 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 26, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/11/06 064312792
+ − Votes (5)
February 28, 2006: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2006: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2006: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2006: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2006: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor