+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (53)
On August 28, 2006 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0005)
On August 28, 2006 in the House:
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (71-Y 0-N)
- Enacted, Chapter 5 (effective see bill)
On August 28, 2006 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (32-Y 1-N 2-A)
- VOTE: (32-Y 1-N 2-A)
- Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (35-Y 0-N)
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (31-Y 2-N 2-A)
- VOTE: (31-Y 2-N 2-A)
- VOTE: (35-Y 0-N)
On August 28, 2006 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (71-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (88-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (88-Y 0-N)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On August 28, 2006 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On August 28, 2006 in the House:
- Reenrolled
On August 28, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reenrolled bill text (SB5019ER2)
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On July 7, 2006 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
- Governor's substitute printed 068172129-S1
On June 29, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On June 28, 2006 in the House:
- Reconsidered by Finance
- Reported from Finance (13-Y 4-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (88-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONSTITUTIONAL READING (88-Y 0-N)
- Motion to pass by substitute offered by Delegate Watts agreed to (50-Y 37-N)
- Read third time
- Floor substitute printed 067388544-H1 ( Watts)
- Passed House (66-Y 22-N)
- VOTE: PASS BY (50-Y 37-N)
- Motion to pass by substitute offered by Delegate Armstrong agreed to (48-Y 38-N)
- VOTE: PASS BY (48-Y 38-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (66-Y 22-N)
On June 28, 2006 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB5019ER)
On June 28, 2006 in the House:
- Enrolled
On June 28, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On June 28, 2006 in the House:
- Floor substitute printed 067389544-H2 (Armstrong)
On June 20, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Tabled in Finance by voice vote
On June 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (24-Y 9-N 2-A)
- Passed Senate (24-Y 9-N 2-A)
- VOTE: (32-Y 0-N 2-A)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N 2-A)
- Engrossed by Senate
- VOTE: (32-Y 0-N 2-A)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N 2-A)
- Read first time
- Reported from Finance (11-Y 0-N 2-A)
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented and ordered printed 068169712
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (14)
August 28, 2006: VOTE: ADOPTION (71-Y 0-N)
August 28, 2006: VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (88-Y 0-N)
August 28, 2006: VOTE: (31-Y 2-N 2-A)
August 28, 2006: VOTE: (35-Y 0-N)
August 28, 2006: VOTE: (32-Y 1-N 2-A)
June 28, 2006: Reported from Finance (13-Y 4-N)
June 28, 2006: VOTE: CONSTITUTIONAL READING (88-Y 0-N)
June 28, 2006: VOTE: PASS BY (50-Y 37-N)
June 28, 2006: VOTE: PASS BY (48-Y 38-N)
June 28, 2006: VOTE: PASSAGE (66-Y 22-N)
June 19, 2006: VOTE: (24-Y 9-N 2-A)
June 19, 2006: VOTE: (32-Y 0-N 2-A)
June 19, 2006: VOTE: (32-Y 0-N 2-A)
June 19, 2006: Reported from Finance (11-Y 0-N 2-A)
+ − Sponsor
John H. Chichester
Type:
Primary Sponsor