+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On November 9, 2020 in the House:
- Left in Rules
On September 17, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On September 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 7-N)
On September 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Amendments #1 and #2 by Senator Petersen agreed to
- Amendment #3 by Senator Petersen withdrawn
- Amendment #4 by Senator Petersen agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB5003E
- Printed as engrossed 20200152D-E
On August 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On August 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On August 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On August 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules (12-Y 1-N 2-A)
On July 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 08/18/20 20200152D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
September 3, 2020: Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 7-N)
August 20, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
August 19, 2020: Reported from Rules (12-Y 1-N 2-A)
+ − Sponsor
Richard H. Stuart
Type:
Primary Sponsor