+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (58)
On April 12, 1994 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0520)
On April 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 520 (effective 7/1/94)
On April 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 1, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB500ER)
On March 15, 1994 in the Senate:
- Conference substitute printed LD7241633 (SB500S2)
On March 12, 1994 in the House:
- Motion for pending question agreed to
On March 12, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reading of conference report waived
- VOTE: ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (38-Y 2-N)
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N)
On March 12, 1994 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to by House (91-Y 7-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 7-N)
On March 12, 1994 in the Senate:
- House substitute rejected by conference committee
- Substitute recommended by conference committee
On March 9, 1994 in the House:
- Delegates: Cranwell, Jackson, Miller
- Conferees appointed by House
On March 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- Senators: Colgan, Cross, Chichester
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- VOTE: ACCEDE TO REQ. FOR CONF (39-Y 0-N)
- Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N)
On March 7, 1994 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
- House insisted on substitute
On March 4, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: REJECTED HOUSE AMENDMENT (6-Y 33-N)
- House substitute rejected by Senate (6-Y 33-N)
- Reading of substitute waived
On March 2, 1994 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute
- VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 8-N)
- Passed House with substitute (88-Y 8-N)
On March 1, 1994 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 28, 1994 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed LD7218168 (SB500H1)
- Reported from Appropriations with sub. (19-Y 3-N)
On February 17, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read first time
On February 16, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 15, 1994 in the Senate:
- Amendment by Sen. Marsh rejected #1
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Amendments by Sen. Colgan agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Engrossed by Senate-comm. substitute W/amdts.
- Amendment by Sen. Marsh rejected #2
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (36-Y 3-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (36-Y 3-N)
- Communicated to House
- Printed as engrossed LD7196605 (SB500ES1)
On February 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 1994 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed LD7196605 (SB500S1)
- Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
On January 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (10)
March 12, 1994: VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 7-N)
March 12, 1994: VOTE: ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (38-Y 2-N)
March 9, 1994: VOTE: ACCEDE TO REQ. FOR CONF (39-Y 0-N)
March 4, 1994: VOTE: REJECTED HOUSE AMENDMENT (6-Y 33-N)
March 2, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 8-N)
February 28, 1994: Reported from Appropriations with sub. (19-Y 3-N)
February 15, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (36-Y 3-N)
February 15, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1994: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor