+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Tabled in Rules by voice vote
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101967D
+ − Votes (3)
February 5, 2014: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2014: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor