+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0481)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 481 (effective 7/1/14)
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB50ER)
- Enrolled
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Title replaced 14105087D-H1
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 4-N)
- Passed House with substitute (95-Y 4-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB50H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 14105087D-H1
- Read third time
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 14105087D-H1
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned ACNRsub: Natural Resources
On January 20, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
On December 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100672D
+ − Votes (7)
March 5, 2014: House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
March 4, 2014: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 4-N)
February 26, 2014: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N)
January 15, 2014: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
January 13, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor