+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 5-N)
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (30-Y 9-N 1-A)
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (12-Y 3-N)
On January 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 5-N)
On December 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101096D
+ − Votes (7)
March 2, 2016: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 5-N)
February 22, 2016: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2016: Read third time and passed Senate (30-Y 9-N 1-A)
February 4, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2016: Reported from Finance (11-Y 4-N)
February 3, 2016: Reported from Finance (12-Y 3-N)
January 18, 2016: Reported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 5-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor