+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0343)
On April 11, 1998 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 343 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 31, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 30, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 30, 1998 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB5ER)
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE SUBSTITUTE R (39-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee substitute agreed to 989759661-H1
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 989759661-H1
- Passed House with substitute (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 4, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 3, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with sub. (24-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 989759661-H1
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 3
On February 4, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 3, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 2, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On January 30, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 29, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 28, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: Revenue Resources
On January 14, 1998 in the Senate:
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 11/26/97 988499661
- Referred to Committee on Finance
+ − Votes (6)
March 10, 1998: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE SUBSTITUTE R (39-Y 0-N)
March 6, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
March 3, 1998: Reported from Finance with sub. (24-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
January 28, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
January 27, 1998: Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor