+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 11, 2000 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0387)
On April 4, 2000 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 387 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 22, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 20, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 20, 2000 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 14, 2000 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB495ER)
On March 1, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (38-Y 0-N)
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Reading of amendment waived
On March 1, 2000 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendment (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
On February 29, 2000 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 28, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with amd (23-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 2
On February 16, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 14, 2000 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2000 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 10, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed 009335420
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
March 1, 2000: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2000: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (38-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2000: Reported from Finance with amd (23-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2000: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2000: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor