+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Left in General Laws
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 5-N)
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: ABC/Gaming
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 20104105D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB495E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (13-Y 2-N)
On January 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104105D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 25, 2020: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 5-N)
January 15, 2020: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 13, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
John S. Edwards
Type:
Primary Sponsor