+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- Motion to pass in enrolled form rejected (20-Y 18-N)
- VOTE: REJECTED-ENROLLED BILL R (20-Y 18-N)
- Senate sustained Governor's veto
On April 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by Governor
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 23, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB494ER)
On March 4, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time
- Motion for pending question agreed to
- Pending question ordered
- Passed House (56-Y 40-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (56-Y 40-N)
On March 3, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 2, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (15-Y 10-N)
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 2
On February 18, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Title replaced
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Printed as engrossed 988987661-E
On February 11, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: Studies
On January 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Presented & ordered printed 988987661
- Referred to Committee on Rules