+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On February 23, 1994 in the House:
- No action taken by Finance by voice vote
On February 22, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 1
On February 8, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
On February 7, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 4, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Amendment by Sen. Goode agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (37-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
- Printed as engrossed LD6909809 (SB493E)
On February 3, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (35-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 4, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (37-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (35-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1994: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor