+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 3, 2006 in the House:
- Incorporated by Courts of Justice (SB200-Houck) by voice vote
On February 22, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Referred from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
On February 14, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Placed on Calendar
On February 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 069029800-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB491S1
On January 31, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (36-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2006 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 069029800-S1
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (12-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2006 in the Senate:
- Assigned ACNR sub: Penalties for Dog Attacks
On January 11, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 060018134