+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (47)
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0522)
On April 15, 1998 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 522 (effective 7/1/98)
On April 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 6, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On April 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB490ER)
On March 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading of conference report waived
- Passed by temporarily
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT R (39-Y 0-N)
- House amendments rejected by conference committee
On March 13, 1998 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 1998 in the House:
- Delegates: May, Tate, Armstrong
- Conferees appointed by House
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Senators: Reasor, Ticer, Schrock, Watkins
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- VOTE: ACCEDE CONFERENCE COMM.R (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 1998 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
- House insisted on amendment
On March 2, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- VOTE: REJECTED HOUSE AMENDMENT R (1-Y 38-N)
- House amendment rejected by Senate (1-Y 38-N)
On February 26, 1998 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendment (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
On February 25, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 24, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. w/amd. (26-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
On February 12, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 11, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 988663727-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On February 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation w/amds. (14-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed 988663727
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (9)
March 13, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
March 13, 1998: VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT R (39-Y 0-N)
March 5, 1998: VOTE: ACCEDE CONFERENCE COMM.R (40-Y 0-N)
March 2, 1998: VOTE: REJECTED HOUSE AMENDMENT R (1-Y 38-N)
February 26, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 24, 1998: Reported from Tra. w/amd. (26-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 5, 1998: Reported from Transportation w/amds. (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor