+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (40)
On April 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 395 (effective 7/1/22)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0395)
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB49ER)
- Enrolled
On March 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Delegates: Cordoza, Batten, Hope
- Conferees appointed by House
- Conference report agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Amended by conference committee
- Conference substitute printed 22107761D-S1
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N)
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senators: Favola, Mason, Hanger
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N)
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
- House insisted on substitute
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N)
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB49H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 22106956D-H1
- Read third time
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 25, 2022 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 22106956D-H1
- Reported from Public Safety with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Assigned PS sub: Subcommittee #2
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Public Safety
On January 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N)
On December 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101581D