+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0709)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 709 (effective 4/6/14)
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB488ER)
- Enrolled
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Read third time
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Read first time
On January 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/08/14 14102023D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
February 27, 2014: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2014: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2014: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2014: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor