+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0399)
On April 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 399 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 31, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 30, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 30, 1998 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB487ER)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time
- Passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (30-Y 0-N)
- Read second time
On February 25, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Cons. & Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 11, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Conservation and Natural Resources
On February 10, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 1998 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to S.Rule20(j), rerefer.by A.C.&N.R. (15-Y 0-N)
- Rereferred to Finance
On January 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Presented & ordered printed 988970633
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
+ − Votes (7)
March 11, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
March 10, 1998: Reported from Appropriations (30-Y 0-N)
February 25, 1998: Reported from Cons. & Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 5, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1998: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1998: Pursuant to S.Rule20(j), rerefer.by A.C.&N.R. (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor