+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (51)
On April 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0910)
- Reenrolled bill text (SB487ER2)
On April 19, 2006 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 910 (effective 7/1/06)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 19, 2006 in the House:
- Reenrolled
On April 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 19, 2006 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (96-Y 0-N)
On April 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N)
On April 18, 2006 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 11, 2006 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 9, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 2006 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB487ER)
- Enrolled
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (30-Y 10-N)
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (30-Y 10-N)
On February 27, 2006 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (70-Y 30-N)
- Passed House with amendments (70-Y 30-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
On February 24, 2006 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 23, 2006 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 22, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with amendments (14-Y 1-N)
On February 14, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On January 31, 2006 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (22-Y 15-N)
- Passed Senate (22-Y 15-N)
- VOTE: (37-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (20-Y 17-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (20-Y 17-N)
On January 30, 2006 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB487S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 065358832-S1
On January 26, 2006 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 065358832-S1
On January 25, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2006 in the Senate:
- Recommitted to General Laws and Technology
- Read second time
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 062613832
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (11)
April 19, 2006: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
April 19, 2006: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2006: VOTE: (30-Y 10-N)
February 27, 2006: VOTE: PASSAGE (70-Y 30-N)
February 22, 2006: Reported from Rules with amendments (14-Y 1-N)
January 31, 2006: VOTE: (20-Y 17-N)
January 31, 2006: VOTE: (37-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2006: VOTE: (22-Y 15-N)
January 25, 2006: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2006: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2006: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor