+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 123 (effective 7/1/12)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0123)
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB487ER)
- Enrolled
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2012 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 16, 2012 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101048D
+ − Votes (6)
February 20, 2012: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2012: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2012: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2012: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2012: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor