+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (41)
On April 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 472 (effective 7/1/10)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0472)
On March 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 22, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB486ER)
- Enrolled
On March 10, 2010 in the Senate:
- Title replaced 10105710D-H1
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On March 9, 2010 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider constitutional reading dispensed agreed to
- Read second time
- Constitutional reading dispensed BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: --- AGREE TO (96-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB486H1
- Constitutional reading dispensed BLOCK VOTE (94-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION #2 (94-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute agreed to 10105710D-H1
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
On March 8, 2010 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 10105710D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 2-N)
On February 16, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal
On February 8, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 10104638D-S1
- Reading of amendment waived
- Amendment by Senator Marsden agreed to (21-Y 19-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB486ES1
- Printed as engrossed 10104638D-ES1
On February 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 29, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 10104638D-S1
On January 14, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal
On January 13, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102004D